Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hemley, Heather Liana, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type08/23/2021 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Continued Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REISSUING TEMPORARY PROTECTION ORDER | |
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF LANCE HEMLEY | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF HEATHER HEMLEY | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 03, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Continued Final Protection Order Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.