Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gann, Timothy Dewayne, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type06/04/2021 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 29, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 15, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Held - Motion 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.