Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Baumann, Raymond Charles, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Roberts, Jason Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedJuly 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type06/01/2021 Uncontested Resolution06/29/2021 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 29, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SURRENDER OF WEAPONS | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROTECTION CONTESTED | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF TEXT MESSAGES | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF TPD INCINDENT REPORT | |
June 15, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Held - Motion 1:00 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.