Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Watts, Dion M, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Martin, Karissa G, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with JOSEPH A EVANS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOSEPH A EVANS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome Type05/28/2021 Uncontested Resolution09/16/2021 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR REVISION | |
September 16, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
September 02, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR JUDGES MOTION CALENDAR | |
August 12, 2022 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO EXCEED TIME | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
August 11, 2022 | Hearing |
DEPT 16 - JUDGE EVANS (Rm. 2-B ) - Continued Motion - Revision Confirmed |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REVISION | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EX PARTE PRESENTATION FEE $40.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.