Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kane, Jessica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Alrashaideh, Moussa, in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type05/27/2021 Uncontested Resolution09/09/2021 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - 9:00 Motion - Renew Protection Or Unconfirmed |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED | |
September 22, 2022 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Motion - Renew Protection Or Unconfirmed |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED | |
September 09, 2022 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Held - Motion Motion - Renew Protection Or Unconfirmed |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDER OF RENEWAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF PARENTING PLAN | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITON TO RENEW PROTECTION ORDER *AMENDED* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.