Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Perry, Rodger J filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Jessica Taylor Reeves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Taylor Reeves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection From Civil Harassment
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Anti-Harassment Perry's appear via Zoom |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF ATTEMPT TO SERVE |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit RESPONSE |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Petition Motion for Protection
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.