Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Horizon Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Phillabaum, Benjamin Donald, against Barnes, Jane Doe, Barnes, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Robin R. McCroskey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin R. McCroskey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2022 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment ATTY PHILLABAUM CALLED IN READY |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum RE SUM JDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.