Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rich, Kyle, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Fischer, Timothy Robert, against 4212 Spring Valley Rd Newport Wa, Estate Of Ruth Slinger, Pend Oreille County, Washington State Dshs, Whitten, David, (total of 5) See All represented by Christy, Joseph, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Robin R. McCroskey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin R. McCroskey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2022 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Partial Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipts FOR DISBURSEMENT OF TRUST FUNDS $74,534.19 |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party RE DEFENDANT THE PUBLIC AT LARGE Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Default RE DEFENDANT PUBLIC AT LARGE Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds TO WINSTON & CASHATT Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other DECLARATION OF SERVICE **FILED IN ERROR IN SPOKANE COUNTY** |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.