Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Enger, Candy, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Trejo, Eugenio Jose, against Skyliners Mhp Llc, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.