Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burggraf, Amy, Burggraf, Dan, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Waid, Brian J, against Linders, Elaine, Ferry Co Professional Services Inc, Pend Oreille Title & Escrow, Pend Oreille Title Co, Michael J Mclaughlin Ps, (total of 8) See All represented by Montgomery, Chris Alan, Jolley, Joseph Steve, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryMal Other Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order TO FILE AMENDED CMP Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing LEAVE TO AMEND |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.