Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anderson, Donna Marie filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick A. Monasmith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick A. Monasmith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2018 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Protection Order RSP'S MOTION TO TERMINATE ORDER |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing RSP'S MOTION TO TERMINATE ORDER |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Motion to Modify | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 5: COURT HEARING MINUTES 05/03; |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection From Civil Harassment 4: OR FOR PROTECT FROM CIVIL HARASSMEN; |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.