Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gay, Woodrow Nathaniel filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Philip J. Van de Veer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhilip J. Van de Veer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2018 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order RE: TEMPORARY PARENTING PLAN |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 15: COURT HEARING MINUTES 05/25; |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING; COMMISS PHILIP J. VAN DE VEER; | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 14: ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.