Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gleese, Iii, John T, Gleese, Trina, H W, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mclaughlin, Michael John, against All Occupants, Mende, Ian, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick A. Monasmith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick A. Monasmith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 10: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution 9: WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF RESTITUTION ISSUED; | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes 8: COURT HEARING MINUTES 02/08; |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Directing Issuance of Writ 7: ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT; |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING; JUDGE PATRICK A. MONASMITH; | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
DC Default Judgments and All Civil Matters SHOW CAUSE HEARING--1:30 PM |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 6: DECLARATION OF POSTING 1/27; |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 5: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 02-08-2018DC; SHOW CAUSE HEARING--1:30 PM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.