Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gray, Lilly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rascoff, Benjamin Henry, against Nichols, Braden, Nichols, Deborah, Nichols, Eathen, W H, represented by Greer, Robert Franklin, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 6: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: DCLR OF SERVICE - MULTIPLE; |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 4: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS; |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Rascoff, Benjamin Henry; |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.