Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wain, Christopher, filed a(n) Lca Lower Court Appeal - Civil case against Washington State Patrol, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J. Richter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryLca Lower Court Appeal - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision DISMISSED/REMANDED TO NO DIST |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
RALJ Hearing
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter TO: JUDGE |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal on RALJ Decision Lower Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.