Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Clearwater, Sloan M, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rhodes, Gregory M, against Chester Club & Oyster Bar, Inc, Doe Pine, Jane, Pine, Mickey Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryWde Wrongful Death |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice RE: CHESTER CLUB & OYSTER BAR, INC |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Resolution Default Judgment DEFENDANT PINE |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default AGAINST DEFENDANT'S PINE |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default PROPOSED |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant's Chester Club and Oyster Bar |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.