Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tucker, Richard P, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Johnson, Eric Brian, against Pierson, Teresa, Pierson, Woody, Jr, Woody'S Septic Specialties, Inc, represented by Dennis, Franklin Lee, Thompson, Mark Augustus, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J. Richter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection Opposition | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection Opposition | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF: ERIC JOHNSON |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection Opposition | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order PROIPOSED |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF MARK THOMPSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.