Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Seaview Sewer District, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Frimodt, Eric Clayton, against Bank Of America Na, Neutren, Glenn, Neutren, Jane Doe, Pacific County, Prlap Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2017 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Allowing Service By Mail |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons 2nd amended |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS - AMENDED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.