Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Kust, Christoph R, Kust, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Application | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Application | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 8: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 7: AFFIDAVIT SOLDIER'S SAILORS' ACT; |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 6: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 5: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.