Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Western Peterbilt Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Bernheim, Lucie R, against Jerles, Jane Doe, Jerles, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2017 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order AND SUBPOENA PER RCW 50.13.070 |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Application | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of NonMilitary Service | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.