Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Olympic Credit Service Inc, Wenatchee Electric Llc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Steinberg, Charles Raymond, against Anderson, Christain A., Anderson, Jane Doe, Christain Anker , Inc.. A Washington Corportion, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts with Henry A. Rawson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry A. Rawson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryAbj Abstract Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order AND SUBPOENA Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration FOR ORDER FOR SUBPOENA |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.