Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Odegaard, Darin, Odegaard, Lisa, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against City Of Tonasket, represented by Van Wert, Ronald Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Order of Default & Motion for Attorney's Fees Judge: Colbert, Robert R |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ||
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service RONALD A. VAN WERT (ATTORNEY FOR CITY OF TONASKET) |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order of Default & Motion for Attorney's Fees |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Motion for Order of Default & Motin for Attorney's Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.