Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Valley Equipment Company, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Chambers, Adam Joseph, against Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Cashmere Valley Bank, Rock Garden Holding, Llc., Christian Anker, Inc., represented by Windus, Thomas Kent, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS SUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Thomas K. Windus |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Of Non-Service Of: Summons; Complaint for foreclosure of Lien |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Dismissal Without Prejudice of Cashmere Valley Bank Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Served on 03/13/2020 at 3:36 p.m. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.