Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Searer, Lila A, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Schiesser, Robert M., against Golden Phoenix Trading Inc, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts with Henry A. Rawson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry A. Rawson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2019 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Default Against All Defendants Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Quieting Title Against All Defendants Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion For Order of Default and Entry of Default Judgment |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing of Copy of Summons and Complaint |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes This hearing was addressed on CRT #19-2-00523-24 on 02/11/2020 Judge: Colbert, Robert R |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Colbert, Robert R |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.