Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thind Pmr Enterprises Ll, Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Montoya, Kevan Tino, against Mendez, Guillermo S, Mendez And Leon, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AND WITHOUT COST Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Robert M. Schiesser |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer BY DEF'S TO PLF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONVERT UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION TO CIVIL ACTION AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF SERVICE TO GUILLERMO MENDEZ |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.