Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Boutain, Raymond L., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Chadwick, Kenneth W, against Brandy'S Antiques, Llc., B Street Bud, Llc., Comstock, Jean E., represented by Zimmerman, Steven Arden, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Of Counsel for Plaintiff |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Re: Kenneth W. Chadwick With Certificate of Service on: 09/12/19 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing FOR DEFAULT Judge: Colbert, Robert R |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Email STRIKING 9-4-18 HEARING |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance TYLER HOTCHKISS, STEVE Z ZIMMERMAN |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.