Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robinson, Diana M., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Abeyta, Rodney K, against City Of Omak, Department Of Transportation, Washington, Granite Construction, represented by Biggs, Andrew Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts with Henry A. Rawson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry A. Rawson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2018 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds MOTION, DECLARATION AND ORDER Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipts FROM DEPARTMENT OF ENTERPRISE SERVICES CHECK #500876B |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATED JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF WASHINGTON Judge: Grim, Robert W |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice INVOICE |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers DEFENDANT STATE OF WASHINGTON DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL CLERK'S PAPERS AND EXHIBITS |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION III |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM DIVISION III COURT OF APPEALS |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.