Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Baker, Gregg, Baker, Jennifer, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by O'Connell, Thomas Francis, against Barker, Jake, Barker, Stephanie, Lexon Insurance Company, represented by Thomason, Alexander Harris Sol, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts with Christopher E. Culp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Culp Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AND ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT CLAIM AND WITHOUT COSTS Judge: Huber, Brian C |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena OF DAN HIGBEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.