Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pfortmiller, Kip, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shabino, Allen N., against Business Entities I-X, John And Jane Does I-X, Krauss, James M, Krauss, Jane Doe, Mason Transit Authority, (total of 5) See All represented by Sanders, Michael George, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Monty D. Cobb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonty D. Cobb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice s/b WITH prejudice Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.