Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Spaulding, Mila, Spaulding, Thomas, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Whitehouse, Stephen Talcott, against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, The Allstate Company, The Allstate Insurance Company, represented by Foley, Douglas Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Goodell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Goodell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.