Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Onyx Agronomics, Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Paine, Nathan, against Ninja Gardens Inc., in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Goodell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Goodell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Praecipe FOR EXECUTION |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR AUTHORIZATION |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.