Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gonzales, Ashley, Gonzales, Ryan, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bonin, John Robert, against Doe Defendant 1-10, Kia Motors, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.