Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ruff, Bonnie B, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Jones, Ryan Jeffrey, against Rei Construction, Llc, Rei Contractors, Llc, Rodgers, Daniel"Sonny", represented by Horton, David P, Templeton, Ronald C., in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Monty D. Cobb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonty D. Cobb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confession of Judgment
Judge: Butler, Tirsa C |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Butler, Tirsa C |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 set 5-days |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Hearing TRIAL STRICKEN, SETTLEMENT Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Omnibus
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Received email confirmation from Christa Hoskins 7/12/22 at 11:12 AM - SL Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.