Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Filter, Bradley, Filter, Katherine, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bonrud, Neal Ernest, Jr, against Foremost Insurance Co, represented by Blackburn, Joanne Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Goodell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Goodell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer to complaint |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.