Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sobba, Andrew, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Baer, Evan Robert Joseph, against Candid Construction Llc, A Washington Limited Liability Company, Fehlman, Charles, Fehlman, Jane Doe, Western Surety Company, represented by Thornburgh, Piper Mcgregor, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Goodell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Goodell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order AND STIPULATION Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of settlement of all claims. |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of settlement of all claims |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreement STIPULATED E-SERVICE AGREEMENT |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.