Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tucker, Leilani, Tucker, David, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dailey, Dustin John, against Comact Equipment Us Inc, represented by Dynan, Mark J., in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Finlay, Amber L |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal STIPULATED Judge: Finlay, Amber L |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.