Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bosseler, Elaine M, Bosseler, John D, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Whitehouse, Stephen Talcott, against Stewart Title Company, represented by Thomas, Jeffrey M., in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.