Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lincoln County, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Office Of The Attorney General, Public Employment Relations Commission, Teamsters Local 690, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, WA, . Lincoln County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary J. Libey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2018 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLincoln County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandate AMENDED |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Index OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Index | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.