Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lucas, Malakai filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, WA, . Lincoln County, WA Superior Courts with John F. Strohmaier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn F. Strohmaier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
CategoryMst2 Minor Settlement - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLincoln County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit PROOF OF DEPOSIT |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Approve Petition
Judge: Strohmaier, John F |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement ORDERED TO PAY IN AND OUT OF COURT |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Settlement | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem 3: REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem 2: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM; GUARDIAN AD LITEM ATTORNEY: WORKLAND, GREGORY J; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.