Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hagen, Dori, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Robbins, Dale, Md, against K&S Hansen Inc, Mutual Of Enumclaw Insurance, represented by Doll, Kent Neil, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, WA, . Lincoln County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2017 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLincoln County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 7: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 5: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 6: NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Doll, Kent Neil; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 3: MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint 4: AMENDED COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.