Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Finney, Randolph Lee filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit re: Atty Fees |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Amended Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.