Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pettit, Daniel, Pettit, Tammie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Holman, James L., against Li, Md, Zhongzeng, Olympia Neurology, Pllc, Providence Health & Services-Wa, represented by O'Halloran, Scott Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer - 2nd amended complaint |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint 2nd - Declining Voluntary Arbitration |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Amend Complaint |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance -Amended (Def) |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit J. Blankenship re Voluntary Arbitration |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.