Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Davis, Mitchell K., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by O'Rourke, Shane Michael, against Fujitec America, Inc., National Elevator Inspection Services, Inc., Panzo, Michael J., represented by Gheen, E. Pennock, Iii, Tramountanas, Athan Emmanuel, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.