Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Whaley, Lynda, Whaley, Scott, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Dugaw, Paul Joseph, against Meb Reo Trust Vi, Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, represented by Garfield, Garrett Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Yeager, Joely |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.