Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Autry, Jesse W., filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Department Of Labor & Industries Of The State Of Washington, Walsh Trucking Co., Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryAlrjt Administrative Law Review-Jury Trial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Board of II Appeals to counsel |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Superior Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.