Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wasson, Allen Gaylord, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Mckean, Collin C., against The Tiller Law Firm, Tiller, Laurel L., represented by Downer, Jeffrey Paul, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMal Other Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial VJ Svoboda |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Assigned to VJ Svoboda (Grays Harbor) |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge
Judge: Yeager, Joely |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.