Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hood, Eric, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against City Of Chehalis, represented by Hillier, Erin L, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Service | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.