Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martin, Jesse, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Cushman, Benjamin D, against City Of Winlock, represented by Harper, Kenneth W., in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order re: Entry |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Change of address |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Counterclaim |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service -Amended |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.