Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Paxton, Patricia, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Lanza, Eric, against Cowlitz Timber Trails Association, represented by Andersen, Matthew J, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Continuance | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support P. Paxton |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Partial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.