Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kirkendoll, Marion E., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mitchelson, Robert David, against Cement Distributors, Inc, A Washington Corp., Torell, Mark E., represented by Maddalena, Rossi F, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Protective Order & Terms |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit re Mt to Dismiss & Refile |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.